Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Salonia, O.F.M. Cap.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Palermo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Buthrotum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1947 Born
4 Oct 196316.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Nov 196821.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Jul 197123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Feb 201769.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
10 Feb 201769.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Buthrotum
Apr 2017²69.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buthrotum

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Salonia (VIAF: 232957415)
Father Giovanni Salonia O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Palermo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Mar 2017