Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Salix, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornCaier
26 Sep 166151.7SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
21 Nov 166151.8ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
Mar 166858.1DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ján Salix:
Bishop Ján Salix O. Cist. , Bishop of Pécs

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 290, and Page 379
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 2 Apr 2015