Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Salerni, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1671Born
29 Nov 171948.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 172049.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
20 Feb 172654.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
30 Jan 172957.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Salerni
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Salerni S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosenza, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1719

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast