Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Antonio Salerni

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1679Born
25 Nov 170324.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 170324.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 171435.1AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
28 Oct 171435.2Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
14 Apr 175474.7DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Antonio Salerni
Bishop Fabrizio Antonio Salerni (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosenza

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1740
  • b/ob: CB, 31 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,026
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018