Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Agostino Sajeva

Deceased

Bishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1794Born
20 Sep 181722.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 184550.4SelectedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
19 Jan 184651.1ConfirmedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
13 Mar 186772.3DiedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Agostino Sajeva
Bishop Cesare Agostino Sajeva (born , died ) Bishop of Piazza Armerina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgrigento

  • a priest for 49.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 310
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,846, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast