Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Sahagún, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1668BornMetras, Portugal
22 Jul 170941.3AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1710²41.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
12 Oct 173062.5DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João de Sahagún:
Bishop João de Sahagún O.A.D. (born , died ) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a bishop for 20.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2?: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,820

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013