Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Cardinal Sáenz de Aguirre, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1630BornLogroño, Spain
2 Sep 168656.4Elevated to Cardinal
10 Nov 168757.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
30 Aug 169464.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
19 Aug 169969.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

MicroData Summary for José Sáenz de Aguirre:
Cardinal José Sáenz de Aguirre O.S.B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

  • a cardinal for 13.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013