Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Sadoleto

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Dec 1591AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carpentras, France
4 Dec 1591AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicomedia
25 Feb 1592Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicomedia
1 Jan 1593SucceededBishop of Carpentras, France
23 Jun 1596DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

MicroData Summary for François Sadoleto (VIAF: 286980393)
Bishop François Sadoleto (died ) Bishop of Carpentras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Marc, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,592, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast