Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Sacripante

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1642Born
12 Dec 169553.7Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 169653.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
2 Jan 169653.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
4 Dec 170058.7AppointedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary
9 Dec 170462.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
3 Mar 172178.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
31 Jul 172684.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
4 Jan 172784.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Sacripante
Giuseppe Cardinal Sacripante (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNarni, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 31.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast