Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Magnus von Sachsen-Lauenburg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1390BornBraunschweig
14 Mar 141019.7SelectedBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
Sep 141020.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
25 Apr 141827.8ConfirmedBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
10 May 142433.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
12 May 142433.8SucceededBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
20 May 145261.8ResignedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
21 Sep 145262.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Magnus von Sachsen-Lauenburg:
Bishop Magnus von Sachsen-Lauenburg (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

  • a bishop for 42.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013