Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Hector-Honoré-Maxime de Sabran

Deceased

Bishop of Laon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1739BornAiguines
10 Aug 177737.6SelectedBishop of Laon, France
30 Mar 177838.3ConfirmedBishop of Laon, France
26 Apr 177838.3Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
1811¹71.0DiedBishop of Laon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Hector-Honoré-Maxime de Sabran:
Bishop Louis-Hector-Honoré-Maxime de Sabran (born , died 1811) Bishop of Laon

  • a bishop for 32.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015