Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paweł Rzewuski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Prusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1804Born
22 Jul 182723.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 186359.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
16 Mar 186359.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusa
22 Oct 189288.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Paweł Rzewuski (VIAF: 166545496)
Father Paweł Rzewuski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTelaki

  • a priest for 65.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • not ordb: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 471
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017