Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Russell

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jun 1476AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 1476Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
7 Jul 1480AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
30 Dec 1494DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Russell
Bishop John Russell (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 18.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,471
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 20, and Page 568
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 177, and Page 224
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018