Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ruiz de Medina

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1489AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
27 Mar 1493AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
20 Feb 1495AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
16 Mar 1502AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
30 Jan 1507DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ruiz de Medina
Bishop Juan Ruiz de Medina (died ) Bishop of Segovia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 210, and Page 97
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 234, and Page 119
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,489, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast