Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Marie Ruffo, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1618BornBalneria
10 Apr 168465.5AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
30 Apr 169172.6DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Marie Ruffo:
Archbishop Tommaso Marie Ruffo O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015