Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph de Rojas y Spinola, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹BornGeldern, Netherlands
3 Jul 166640.5SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
16 Jan 166842.0ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
11 Mar 166842.1Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
27 Jul 168559.5SelectedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
3 May 168761.3ConfirmedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
12 Mar 169569.1DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph de Rojas y Spinola:
Bishop Christoph de Rojas y Spinola O.F.M. (born 1626, died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 285, and Page 380
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015