Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vicente Ramos y García

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1769BornAlmonte
1798¹28.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
22 May 182252.5SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
27 Sep 182252.8ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
9 Jun 182454.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Segorbe, Spain
6 Apr 184676.4DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Ramos y García
Father Vicente Ramos y García (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Segorbe

  • a priest for 48.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 341
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 May 2016