Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arnaud Royardi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sarlat


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1321AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
31 May 1321Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
27 Jun 1330AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Sarlat, France
1334¹DiedBishop of Sarlat, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arnaud Royardi:
Archbishop Arnaud Royardi O.F.M. Bishop of Sarlat

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 430, and Page 436
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013