Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Roverella

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1406²BornRovigo
15 Jul 144438.5AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
26 Sep 144539.7AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
18 Dec 146156.0Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jan 146256.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
9 Jan 147569.0ResignedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
2 May 147670.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ravenna, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Roverella:
Cardinal Bartolomeo Roverella (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna

  • a cardinal for 14.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013