Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aurelio Cardinal Roverella

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1748BornCesena, Italy
21 Feb 179445.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 179446.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
27 Mar 180960.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
Apr 1809³60.6Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
6 Sep 181264.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Roverella:
Aurelio Cardinal Roverella (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 4
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1794

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015