Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raoul Roussel

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jan 1444AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
26 Jul 1444Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rouen, France
31 Dec 1452DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Raoul Roussel
Archbishop Raoul Roussel (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Ouen, Abbey

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 225
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,748

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Jun 2020

Quantcast