Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pierre Rougeyron, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

Priest of Society of Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1817Born
23 Apr 184326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
185537.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
187355.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Nov 190285.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Pierre Rougeyron
Father Pierre Rougeyron S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie

  • a priest for 59.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast