Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Roth von Wemding

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1426Born
17 May 146841.4AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
16 Feb 148255.2SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
4 Mar 148255.2ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Jan 150679.1DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Johann Roth von Wemding (VIAF: 27941312)
Bishop Johann Roth von Wemding (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWemding

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 174, and Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1468, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast