Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Rotheram (Scott)

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1423Born
11 Jan 146844.3AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
3 Apr 146844.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
8 Jan 147248.3AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
7 Jul 148056.8AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
29 May 150076.7DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Rotheram (Scott)
Archbishop Thomas Rotheram (Scott) (born , died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRotherham, South Yorkshire

  • a bishop for 32.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,469
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 20, and Page 568
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 177, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 148
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 112
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast