Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Rosso (de Rubeis)

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1581AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
23 Jan 1589AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
28 Oct 1602DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Rosso (de Rubeis):
Bishop Luciano Rosso (de Rubeis) (died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 217, and Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 1 Dec 2013