Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Rossi (Roberti), O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rethymo (Calamona), Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Nov 1446AppointedBishop of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
20 Sep 1447AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston) et Curzola (Korcula), Croatia
1450¹ResignedBishop of Stagno (Ston) et Curzola (Korcula), Croatia
9 Jan 1456AppointedBishop of Rethymo (Calamona), Greece
1 Apr 1466³DiedBishop of Rethymo (Calamona), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rossi (Roberti)
Bishop Giovanni Rossi (Roberti) O.E.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Rethymo (Calamona)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 114, and Page 112
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Aug 2021

Quantcast