Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard (Yvest) du Rosier

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1400¹Born
15 Feb 144747.1AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
9 Jan 145050.0AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
3 Jan 145252.0AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
18 Mar 147474.2DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard (Yvest) du Rosier:
Archbishop Bernard (Yvest) du Rosier (died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 252, and Page 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013