Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Rosato

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1626³BornPalestrina
12 Sep 165024.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 165024.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 168457.9AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
22 Jan 169669.5DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Rosato:
Bishop Stefano Rosato (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

  • a priest for 45.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 161
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015