Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Rol (Raol, Raolis)

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1238SelectedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
20 Dec 1239ConfirmedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
20 Dec 1239Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 1239³Ordained BishopBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
Aug 1241²DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Rol (Raol, Raolis)
Bishop Joćo Rol (Raol, Raolis) (died Aug 1241) Bishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 1.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,045
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 506
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast