Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Rojas Henríques, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1539²Born
6 Mar 159152.1AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
26 May 159152.4Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
30 Aug 159556.6AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
9 Mar 160263.1DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rojas Henríques (VIAF: 160250568)
Bishop Pedro Rojas Henríques O.S.A. (born 1539, died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valladolid, Diocese of Valladolid
Death PlaceBurgo de Osma

  • a bishop for 10.7 years

Source(s):
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 122
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 103, Number 652
  • bd/bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018