Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Nicolás Rojas y Argandoña

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1727³BornLa Serena
18 Dec 179568.9AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1796²69.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
24 May 180376.3DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Nicolás Rojas y Argandoña
Bishop Manuel Nicolás Rojas y Argandoña (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

  • a bishop for 7.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 188
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Mar 2016