Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Aurelio Rozo Gutiérrez, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Vichada, Colombia

Priest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1933Born
9 Aug 195926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
6 May 197744.1AppointedPrefect of Vichada, Colombia
22 Dec 199966.7ResignedPrefect of Vichada, Colombia
10 Jun 201986.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Vichada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Aurelio Rozo Gutiérrez
Father José Aurelio Rozo Gutiérrez S.M.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Vichada

  • a priest for 59.8 years

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 12 Jun 2019

Quantcast