Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Joseph Roduit, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1939Born
15 Nov 196424.9ProfessedMember of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
4 Sep 196525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
5 Apr 199959.3SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
14 May 199959.4ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
31 Jul 199959.6InstalledAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
18 Mar 201575.2RetiredAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
17 Dec 201576.0DiedAbbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Roduit
Abbot Joseph Roduit C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaillon

  • a priest for 50.2 years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast