Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Rode

Deceased

Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1445¹Born
1468¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
30 Jan 149752.0SelectedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
28 Apr 149752.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
6 Jun 149752.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
4 Dec 151166.9DiedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Rode
Archbishop Johann Rode (born 1445, died ) Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBremen, Archdiocese of Bremen (and Hamberg)

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,626
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1497, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast