Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Rockeby

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
28 May 1507AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
28 Jan 1512AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
21 Nov 1521DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Rockeby
Archbishop William Rockeby (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 243, and Page 188
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,507, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast