Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Mikhail Rizzi el-Bkoufani

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1526²Born
1560¹34.0Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
29 Mar 156741.2SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
21 Sep 158155.7DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikhail Rizzi el-Bkoufani
Patriarch Mikhail Rizzi el-Bkoufani (born 1526, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKfar-Haura
Death PlaceQannoubin

  • a bishop for 21.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 26 Apr 2014
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018