Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josť Domingo Rivero

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1702BornSan Felices de Buelna
6 Aug 177067.7AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
Dec 177068.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
Jan 177168.1DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Josť Domingo Rivero:
Bishop Josť Domingo Rivero (born ) Bishop of Ceuta

  • a bishop for .1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013