Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Riva (Ripa)

Deceased

Bishop of Terni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹BornCremona
13 Sep 159555.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 160666.3AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
8 Sep 161373.7DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Riva (Ripa):
Bishop Ludovico Riva (Ripa) (died ) Bishop of Terni

  • a priest for 18.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013