Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Rinuccini

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1743Born
21 Feb 179450.6Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 179451.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
21 Dec 179451.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 180158.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rinuccini
Giovanni Cardinal Rinuccini (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlorence, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1794

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018