Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafino Rinaldo (de Nuceria), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹BornNapoli
27 Jul 162665.5SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
14 Apr 162766.2ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
27 Apr 162766.3DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Serafino Rinaldo (de Nuceria):
Bishop Serafino Rinaldo (de Nuceria) O.P. (died ) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015