Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Maurus (Josef) Riha, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Austria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1889BornBraunau am Inn, Austria
12 Jul 191425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1958²69.0AppointedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
1966²77.0ResignedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Oct 197182.8DiedAbbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurus (Josef) Riha:
Abbot Maurus (Josef) Riha O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

  • a priest for 57.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013