Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Righetto (Ragazzinus), C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1586AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
9 Feb 1586Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
1593²DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Righetto (Ragazzinus)
Bishop Girolamo Righetto (Ragazzinus) C.R.L. (died 1593) Bishop of Caorle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreviso, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained BishopSanta Maria della Pace, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 151
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,099
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 3*
  • c2+: AT, 22 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,054

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast