Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Rietberg

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1456¹Born
13 Jul 148226.5SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
11 Nov 148226.8ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
18 Apr 149741.2AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
9 Feb 150852.1DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Rietberg (VIAF: 80765705)
Bishop Konrad von Rietberg (born 1456, died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247, and Page 264
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 208, and Page 194
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 50*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Dec 2018

Quantcast