Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478¹BornVisps
8 Sep 152951.7SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
15 May 153254.4ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
21 Jul 153254.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
17 Mar 154870.2DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adrian von Riedmatten:
Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 295
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013