Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Riçoma

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1345AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
24 Jul 1346AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
7 Jun 1361DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Riçoma
Bishop Miguel de Riçoma (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 526, and Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast