Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Baptist Richolosky

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1752³Born
29 Oct 177522.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jun 177623.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 180855.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
11 Jan 180855.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
27 Sep 180956.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ján Baptist Richolosky
Bishop Ján Baptist Richolosky (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoniklá

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018