Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michelangelo Cardinal Ricci

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1619Born
1 Sep 168162.5Elevated to Cardinal
17 Nov 168162.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
12 May 168263.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Ricci
Michelangelo Cardinal Ricci (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018