Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Ricci

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1679BornRome, Italy
9 Sep 174364.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174364.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
3 May 174465.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Jan 175575.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ricci:
Francesco Cardinal Ricci (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

  • a cardinal for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015