Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Ricci Paracciani

Deceased

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1830BornRoma, Italy
13 Dec 188050.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
27 Mar 188251.8Elevated to Cardinal
30 Mar 188251.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
1 Jun 189161.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
6 Oct 189262.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
9 Mar 189463.8DiedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ricci Paracciani:
Cardinal Francesco Ricci Paracciani (born , died ) Archpriest of Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

  • a cardinal for 13.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 51, and Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Dec 1880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013