Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovambattista Ricasoli

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Oct 1538AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
14 Feb 1560AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
23 Feb 1572DiedBishop of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovambattista Ricasoli
Bishop Giovambattista Ricasoli (died ) Bishop of Pistoia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 179
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018